+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 19, 2000 in the House:
- Laid on the table. See S. 704 for further action.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7806-7807
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1349 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Pease moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 14, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 506.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-851 .
On July 19, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 27, 2000 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
On September 30, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 12, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor