+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 8, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-355.
- Signed by President.
On September 6, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 6, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On August 25, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On August 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Senate receded from certain amendments.
- Senate agreed to House amendments to certain Senate amendments.
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #368 .
On August 17, 1978 in the House:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #715 .
- Motion to recommit to the Committee on conference report rejected in House.
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendment with an amendment.
- Motion to recede from its disagreement and concur in certain Senate amendments rejected in House, roll call #716 .
- House insisted on its disagreement to certain Senate amendment.
On August 10, 1978 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 95-1475.
On August 9, 1978 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On August 7, 1978 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #288 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
On August 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On August 1, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 95-1061.
On July 24, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On July 20, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #580 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On July 13, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 95-1350.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor