+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held and Ordered to be Reported Prior to Referral See P.L. 115-33 (S. 496) for further action.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 49.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-85.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor