+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On December 10, 1985 in the House:
- See H.R.2005 .
On May 9, 1985 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On March 7, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On March 6, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Transportation and Tourism.
On February 28, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor