+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 29, 1974 in the House:
- Vetoed by President, H. Doc. 93-380.
On October 17, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 16, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 16, 1974 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendments to Senate amendments.
On October 11, 1974 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment.
On October 3, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On October 1, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1206.
On May 8, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Labor and Public Welfare.
On May 7, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On May 2, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Education and Labor, H. Rept. 93-1024.
On March 7, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor