+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-75. (TXT | PDF)
- Presented to President.
- Signed by President.
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4476-4477)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4476)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1329.
- Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 83.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-134.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor