+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House