+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On September 24, 1974 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate under "Subjects on the Table".
On June 12, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, S. Rept. 93-923.
On April 4, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred jointly to Senate Committees on Commerce and Government Operations.
On April 3, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #141 .
On March 29, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Government Operations with amendment, H. Rept. 93-962.
On February 28, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor