+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 117-143.
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2679)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 329.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1298.
- Ms. Wasserman Schultz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H323-324)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H323)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H323)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House