+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5841)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1296.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5841-5842)
- Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-747.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor