+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On May 6, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On March 26, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On March 18, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On March 3, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On February 26, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor