+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce for a period ending not later than Oct. 1, 2012.
- Committee on Rules discharged.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules
- Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 112-507 , Part I.
- House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 1, 2012.
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor