+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On July 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Tactical Air and Land Forces.
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Homeland Security, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor