+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 29, 1998 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-207.
- Signed by President.
On July 17, 1998 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 14, 1998 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
On July 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On May 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 1046 with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 99-0.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 1046 amended.
On April 24, 1997 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 126 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 126 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1273 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill. Measure will be read by title. Bill is open to amendments.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 126 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable John J. Duncan Jr. to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- H.AMDT.32 Amendment offered by Mr. Coburn. An amendment to provide that no funds be authorized in the bill for the United States Man and Biosphere Program or related projects.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1273 .
- H.AMDT.32 On agreeing to the Coburn amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- H.AMDT.33 Amendment offered by Ms. Jackson-Lee . An amendment to express the sense of the Congress that the Director shall, to the greatest extent practicable under existing authority, donate surplus computers and other research equipment to elementary and secondary education schools to enhance their science and mathematical programs.
- H.AMDT.33 On agreeing to the Jackson-Lee amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
On April 23, 1997 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 126 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1273 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill. Measure will be read by title. Bill is open to amendments.
On April 21, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 46.
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 105-63 .
On April 16, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 10, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.32
An amendment to provide that no funds be authorized in the bill for the United States Man and Biosphere Program or related projects.
H.AMDT.33
An amendment to express the sense of the Congress that the Director shall, to the greatest extent practicable under existing authority, donate surplus computers and other research equipment to elementary and secondary education schools to enhance their science and mathematical programs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor