+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-85.
On December 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 14, 2011 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 418 - 1 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-325 .
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 97.
- Mr. Fleischmann moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1264 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Fleischmann objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On June 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.