+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 16, 1983 in the House:
- Failed to Receive 2/3's Vote to Suspend and Pass by Yea-Nay Vote: 179 - 245 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On June 22, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From HHS.
On May 16, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 96.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Education and Labor. Report No: 98-158.
On May 10, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Select Education Discharged.
On March 9, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Select Education.
On February 3, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor