+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 152.
On June 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Cloture not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55-44.
- Considered by Senate.
On June 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion on the bill presented in Senate.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On June 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 152.
On June 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On May 26, 1999 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 186 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 186 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1259 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The amendment specified in section 2 of H. Res. 186 , the rule providing for consideration of the bill, shall be considered as adopted.
- H.AMDT.134 On agreeing to the Rules amendment Agreed to pursuant to H. Res. 186 . Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 186 , the amendment in Section 2 of the resolution is considered as adopted.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with two hours of debate on H.R. 1259 . Pursuant to H. Res. 186 , the two hours of debate will be equally divided and controlled among the chairmen and ranking minority members of the Committees on the Budget, Rules, and Ways and Means.
- Mr. Rangel moved to recommit with instructions to Ways and Means.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- MOTION TO RECOMMIT WITH INSTRUCTIONS - Mr. Rangel moved to recommit the bill to the Commmittee on Ways and Means with instructions to report the same back forthwith with amendments to preserve budget surpluses until Social Security and Medicare Solvency Legislation is enacted.
- The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 205 - 222 .
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 416 - 12 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 24, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 186 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1259 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The amendment specified in section 2 of H. Res. 186 , the rule providing for consideration of the bill, shall be considered as adopted.
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.134
Pursuant to the provisions of
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor