+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 17, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 12, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 21, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 17, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 16, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 8, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Justice.
On February 3, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor