+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 6, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-124.
On November 30, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 22, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 395.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson without amendment. Without written report.
On November 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Security.
On May 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On May 24, 1999 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1251 .
- Mr. Davis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 362 - 0 .
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor