+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 14, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-361.
- Signed by President.
On July 6, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On July 1, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On July 1, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
- Cleared for White House
On July 1, 1976 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #375 .
On June 30, 1976 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #493 .
- Motion to recommit conference report to the Committee of Conference rejected in House, roll call #492 .
On June 28, 1976 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 94-1004.
On June 25, 1976 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-1305.
On May 27, 1976 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On May 26, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #200 .
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On May 25, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
On May 24, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
On May 21, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
On May 20, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 14, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 94-878.
On April 12, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
On April 9, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #187 .
- Measure considered in House.
On April 8, 1976 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On March 26, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 94-967.
On March 11, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor