+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 21, 1999 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1243 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 12, 1999 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-224 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130.
On June 9, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 27, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 6, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 31, 1999 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On March 24, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor