+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On November 20, 1991 in the House:
- Similar Provisions Incorporated In H.R.3749 .
On August 15, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from DOT.
On June 3, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from Justice.
On March 18, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oceanography, Great Lakes, and the Outer Continental Shelf.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, Justice, DOT.
On March 5, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor