+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-467.
On November 2, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 28, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 27, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 855.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 106-433 .
On September 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Committee consideration held.
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On November 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 1, 1999 in the House:
- Mr. Doolittle moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-426 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 248.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1235 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 27, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
On October 7, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 30, 1999 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
On March 23, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor