+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 1, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On August 26, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance, S. Rept. 94-1175.
On June 23, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On June 22, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #424 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On April 29, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1068.
On March 2, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor