+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-342.
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 355 - 7 (Roll no. 436). (text: CR H10278)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1222.
- Mr. Walden moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10278-10280, H10313-10314)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4103 Amendment SA 4103 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4103 Amendment SA 4103 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Durbin. (consideration: CR S7525; text: CR S7525) In the nature of a substitute.
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7525)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7524-7525)
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 555.
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 7 (Roll no. 81). (text: CR H1238-1239)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1246-1247)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1222.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1238-1240)
- Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-329.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 239.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 4103
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.4103
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor