+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
On July 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On June 30, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 270 - 159 .
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 164 - 268 .
- The House proceeded with ten minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions.
- Ms. Jackson-Lee moved to recommit with instructions to Judiciary.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with two hours of debate on H.R. 1218 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1218 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 233 .
- Rule H. Res. 233 passed House.
On June 29, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 233 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1218 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
On June 25, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 118.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-204 .
On June 24, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 23, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 13.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 9, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 8, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 27, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On March 23, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Vote
June 30, 1999: On Passage
- Yeas: 270
- Nays: 159
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor