+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On October 27, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-526.
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 13, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On October 12, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 12, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On October 6, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs, S. Rept. 95-1291.
On September 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 12, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On May 1, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 95-1104.
On April 13, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor