+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 2, 1975 in the House:
- Public law 93-604.
- Signed by President.
On December 24, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 18, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 18, 1974 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment.
On December 17, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 3013 .
- Committee on Government Operations discharged in Senate.
On August 20, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Government Operations.
On August 19, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Reported to House from the Committee on Government Operations with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1300.
On December 21, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor