+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 42.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-66.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House