+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-133.
- Signed by President.
On October 7, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 5, 1987 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 1, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 1, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 25, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 344.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 100-181.
On September 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 8, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources received executive comment from Agriculture Department. Favorable.
On July 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On July 13, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, Agriculture Department, OMB.
On May 28, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On May 27, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 374 - 0 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On April 25, 1987 in the House:
- House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands Discharged.
On April 24, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Apr 25, 87.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 50.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-65.
On April 1, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 24, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 27, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On February 24, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor