+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 26, 2019 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-58. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5482)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4042)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1200.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4042-4043)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 44.
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-68.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor