+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On May 7, 2002 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On April 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Civil Service and Agency Organization.
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On April 2, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor