+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-45. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On August 13, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5205)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3320)
- Ms. Kelly (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1198.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3320)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House