+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
On March 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, House Administration, Financial Services, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House House Administration
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor