+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (38)
On December 20, 2022 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-244.
- Signed by President.
On December 16, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 5, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8755)
- Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1193.
- Mr. Pallone moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8755-8756)
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 6504 proposed by Senator King for Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S6947; text: CR S6947) In the nature of a substitute.
- Senate amendment proposed (on the floor): Amendment SA 6504 proposed by Senator King for Senator McConnell.
- Senate amendment submitted
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6947)
- Amendment SA 6504 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6946-6947)
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6947)
- Senate amendment agreed to: Amendment SA 6504 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On July 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Murray with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 443.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On December 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7518-7522)
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-212.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 153.
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1193.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7518)
On December 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7518)
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On November 17, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (184)
Type:
Primary Sponsor