+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 23, 1974 in the House:
- Pocket vetoed by President.
On December 12, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 9, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report.
On December 4, 1974 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-1305.
On December 3, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1512.
On November 21, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On November 20, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On November 19, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 3057 .
- Committee on Public Works discharged in Senate.
On March 21, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Public Works.
On March 20, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #102 .
On March 12, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works with amendment, H. Rept. 93-891.
On December 12, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor