+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On December 6, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-123.
- Signed by President.
On November 30, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 22, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 394.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson without amendment. Without written report.
On November 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Security.
On May 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On May 26, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On May 24, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1191 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Davis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 26, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor