+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 15, 1974 in the House:
- Vetoed by President, H. Doc. 93-337.
On August 2, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On August 1, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report.
On July 15, 1974 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On July 12, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1193.
On July 9, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report recommitted to the committee of conference.
On June 28, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1167.
On June 12, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On June 11, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On March 28, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On March 26, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry with amendment, S. Rept. 93-751.
On February 19, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry.
On February 7, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, roll call #31 .
- Motion to recommit to Committee on Agriculture rejected in House, roll call #30 .
On January 24, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Agriculture, H. Rept. 93-766.
On December 10, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor