+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 3, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-409.
- Signed by President.
On August 22, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On August 21, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #512 .
On August 12, 1974 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
- Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 93-1083.
On August 12, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1278.
On June 17, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On June 4, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On May 21, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On May 14, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Labor and Public Welfare with amendment, S. Rept. 93-847.
- Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in Senate.
- Committee on Commerce discharged in Senate.
On March 13, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Aeronautical and Space Sciences with amendment, S. Rept. 93-734.
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to Senate Committee on Labor and Public Welfare.
- Referred to Senate Committee on Commerce.
On February 19, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Aeronautical and Space Sciences.
On February 13, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #33 .
On January 28, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Science and Astronautics, H. Rept. 93-769.
On December 10, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Astronautics.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor