+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 21, 1999 in the House:
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1184 .
- Rule H. Res. 142 passed House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1184 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 142 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Ray LaHood to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 142 .
- H.AMDT.49 Amendment offered by Mr. Traficant. Amendment expresses the sense of Congress that, to the greatest extent practicable, equipment and products purchased with funds made available under the bill should be American-made; and prohibits contracts or subcontracts to any person who intentionally affixes "Made in America" labels or other similar inscriptions to products not made in the United States.
- H.AMDT.49 On agreeing to the Traficant amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1184 .
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 414 - 3 .
On April 20, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 142 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1184 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill.
On April 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 106-99 , Part I.
- Committee on Resources discharged.
- House Committee on Resources Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than April 19, 1999.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56.
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to House Science
- Referred to the Committee on Science, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.49
Amendment expresses the sense of Congress that, to the greatest extent practicable, equipment and products purchased with funds made available under the bill should be American-made; and prohibits contracts or subcontracts to any person who intentionally affixes "Made in America" labels or other similar inscriptions to products not made in the United States.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor