+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 1975 in the House:
- Public law 93-631.
- Signed by President.
On December 24, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 19, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 19, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Public Works, S. Rept. 93-1416.
On December 4, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Public Works.
On December 3, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
On November 19, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1478.
On December 5, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor