+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 112-190 .
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 466.
On June 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On October 24, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Young moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1160 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 395 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-168 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 112.
On June 15, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor