+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 554.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-715.
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 1.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor