+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 4, 1988 in the House:
- Failed of Passage in House Over Veto by Yea-Nay Vote: 272 - 152 .
On September 28, 1988 in the House:
- Vetoed by President.
On September 23, 1988 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Cleared for White House.
On September 23, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On September 15, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 59-36. Record Vote No: 329.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2945 Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2945 Amendment SP 2945 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
On September 14, 1988 in the Senate:
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2945 Considered by Senate.
On September 13, 1988 in the Senate:
- Senate vitiated cloture vote on the Committee substitute by Unanimous Consent.
- Considered by Senate.
- S.AMDT.2945 Senate vitiated the cloture vote on the Committee substitute by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2945 Considered by Senate.
On September 9, 1988 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.2945 Cloture motion on the substitute presented in Senate.
- S.AMDT.2945 Proposed by Senator Hollings. In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Cloture motion on the Hollings substitute amendment presented in Senate.
On September 17, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 316.
On September 16, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 263 - 156 .
- House Agreed to Amendments Adopted by the Committee of the Whole.
- Called up by House by Rule.
- Rule Passed House.
On September 9, 1987 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H.Res.256 Reported to House.
- Committee on Rules Granted a Modified Closed Rule Providing Three Hours of General Debate; Waiving All Points of Order.
On August 6, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Ways and Means. Report No: 100-276.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 173.
On August 3, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 14, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 2, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 18, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 8, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 7, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 27, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On February 19, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2945
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor