+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 475.
- Reported by the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. H. Rept. 103-858.
On May 11, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 21, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 15, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 29, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 24, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On January 29, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census, Statistics and Postal Personnel.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On January 5, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor