+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-293.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor