+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On December 6, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From GAO.
On May 5, 1983 in the House:
- See H.R.1244 .
On May 3, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 27, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 26, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 21, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 20, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 22, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, DOT, Army, EPA, OMB, CBO, GAO.
On February 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Economic Development.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, GSA, DOT, ACIR, GAO, Treasury.
On February 9, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Transportation and Tourism.
On February 1, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Rules.
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor