+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On July 11, 1995 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered as unfinished business.
On July 10, 1995 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Studds objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with up to forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Young moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 1, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 57.
- Reported by the Committee on National Security. H. Rept. 104-107 , Part II.
On May 24, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 1, 1995 in the House:
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on National Security for a period ending not later than June 1, 1995.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-107 , Part I.
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 30, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife and Oceans.
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor