+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to the order of May 9, 1995, that if and when reported by the Committee on Commerce, Science and Transportation the bill be referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works for a period not to exceed 20 session days to report or be discharged and placed on the calendar.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 1, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 50.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-105 .
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 30, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, Commerce.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife and Oceans.
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor