+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H785-786)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1132.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H785-788)
- Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 245.
- Committee on the Budget discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-304, Part I.
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor